Rice v. Blankenship et al
Plaintiff: Leon Jackson Rice, Jr
Defendant: D Haley, T Neff and G Blankenship
Case Number: 4:2011cv00088
Filed: February 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER directing the ADC to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Leon Jackson Rice, Jr. ADC# 98901 at 1:00 p.m. on 2/21/2014, and as directed by the Court each day thereafter until the trial is concluded. The ADC is further directed to send with Plaintiff his institutional and medical files. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/30/2014. (ks)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting defts' 63 Motion for Protective Order regarding personal information. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/23/12. (vjt)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER appointing Jason W. Earley to represent pltf in all further proceedings; the Clerk is directed to send pltf and counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/12. (vjt)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 53 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/23/12. (kpr)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting pltf's 36 Motion for Ruling; the Court will rule on the pending motions as stated herein; defts are directed to file a brief within ten days after the Arkansas Court of Appeals issues its mandate; pltf will have fourteen days thereafter to file his response. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/2/11. (vjt)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying pltf's 20 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/16/11. (vjt)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL dismissing without prejudice pltf's due process claim regarding the loss of his personal property; pltf's claims against defts Bradley, Kovach, and Griffin are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf may PROCEED with hi s excessive force claim against defts; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint, and this Order on defts Blankenship, Haley, and Neff without prepayment of fees and costs; J Kovach, Danny E Bradley and Robert Griffin terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/28/11. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Blankenship et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Haley
Represented By: Tracey Michele Dennis
Represented By: Mark Robert Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Neff
Represented By: Tracey Michele Dennis
Represented By: Mark Robert Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Blankenship
Represented By: Mark Robert Hayes
Represented By: Tracey Michele Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Jackson Rice, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?