Pelzer et al v. Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: David Pelzer, David and Ruth Pelzer LLC and David and Matthew Pelzer LLC
Defendant: Armtech Insurance Services and Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 4:2011cv00108
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that ARMtech's motions for summary judgment 53 102 are GRANTED with respect to pltfs' reformation claims, and DENIED as to all other claims; pltfs' 81 joint motion for leave to file an amended complaint is DENIED; Church's motion for summary judgment 106 is DENIED; pltfs' reformation claims are dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/4/13. (vjt)
September 7, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion to consolidate case 4:12-cv-00346 with LEAD CASE 4:11-cv-00108; all further pleadings shall be filed in the LEAD CASE; the 71 Scheduling Order will be the governing scheduling order for these cases. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/7/12. (vjt)
April 11, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Department of Agriculture; Department of Agriculture terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/11/12. (vjt)
February 21, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by ARMtech Insurance Services Inc; Discovery due by 4/2/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/21/12. (vjt)
July 14, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER summarily affirming the Agency decision at issue in Count I of pltfs' complaint; Count I is hereby dismissed with prejudice; denying as moot deft's 38 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/14/11. (vjt)
June 22, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER if pltfs believe that the decision of the Agency to deny reconsideration was arbitrary or capricious, they must submit a brief explaining why, on or before 7/13/11; if such a brief is filed, the response will be due within 60 days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/22/11. (vjt)
March 1, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 31 Motion to File Administrative Record Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/1/11. (vjt)
February 14, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the administrative record must be submitted to the Court by 3/1/11; pltfs' brief must be filed 60 days thereafter; and defts' briefs will be due 60 days thereafter; pltfs' reply brief, if any, must be filed 15 days thereafter; an amended initial scheduling order will be entered in due course. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/14/11. (vjt)
February 8, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon the parties' consent, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case 5:10CV00216-JLH to the Western Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas; NEW CASE NUMBER is 4:11CV00108-JLH. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/8/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelzer et al v. Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armtech Insurance Services
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Dilley
Represented By: Michael Dennis Rawls Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pelzer
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David and Ruth Pelzer LLC
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David and Matthew Pelzer LLC
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?