U S Bank National Association ND v. Elender Escrow Inc et al

Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association ND
Defendant: Elender Escrow Inc, Elender Services LLC, Russell Biszantz, PrimeLending, Netco Inc, Netco Title Inc, Lawyers Title of Nevada Inc, Commonwealth Land Title Company, Jeffery H Brown, Stewart Title Guaranty Company, Shelley A Hickson, Amy Christine Tueckes, Corinthian Title Company Inc, CommerceWest Bank National Association, Judy Pollock and Bryan Kelly
Case Number: 4:2011cv00123
Filed: February 8, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, in accord with the terms of settlement, dismissing all claims of plaintiffs, cross-claimants and counter-claimants against all parties with prejudice, except the claims against Elender Escrow, Inc., Elender Services, LLC, Russell Biszantz, and Mark Russell. The Clerk is directed to pay the amount previously deposited into the registry ($650,000), together with interest accrued, less the applicable registry fees, by appropriate instrument made payable to "U.S. Bank National Association, N.D.," and to release the instrument to its counsel of record. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/17/13. (kpr)
January 18, 2013 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the four defendants to pay an aggregate total of $650,000 to U S Bank National Association ND. The paying parties are to deposit their respective shares into the registry of the Court. Each party's check must be made payab le to "Clerk, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas," and must reference both case numbers. The Clerk is directed to accept these funds for deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/18/13. (kpr)
June 18, 2012 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 181 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court will construe Stewart Title's response to the Motion for Default Judgment to include requests for an extension of time to answer, and that request will be granted. Stewart Title's time in which to file a timely answer is extended up to, and including, June 29, 2012, nunc pro tunc to December 5, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/18/12. (kpr)
January 10, 2012 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 167 Motion for Reconsideration, granting motion for clarification ; and denying 169 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/10/12. (kpr)
November 21, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Dismiss; granting 96 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 111 Motion to Dismiss; granting 120 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 157 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/21/11. (kpr)
July 26, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 147 Motion to Stay ddls until the Court has ruled on the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/26/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U S Bank National Association ND v. Elender Escrow Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association ND
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elender Escrow Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elender Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Biszantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeLending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netco Title Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawyers Title of Nevada Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery H Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley A Hickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Christine Tueckes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinthian Title Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CommerceWest Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?