Bloodworth v. Broadmoor Shopping Center LLC

Plaintiff: Jonna Bloodworth
Defendant: Broadmoor Shopping Center LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00143
Filed: February 15, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/9/11. (kpr)
September 30, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing the parties to let the Court know the status of this case by noon, Friday, October 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/30/11. (kpr)
July 12, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to inform the Court of the status of this case by noon, Friday, July 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/12/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloodworth v. Broadmoor Shopping Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonna Bloodworth
Represented By: Edward I. Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadmoor Shopping Center LLC
Represented By: David P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?