Harris v. Little Rock Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Eddy S Harris, Sr
Defendant: Slammer, Steve Thomas, Little Rock Arkansas, City of, Pulaski County Sheriff Department, Arkansas Department of Motor Vehicles, Blue Hill Wrecker Service Inc and Isaac Cornetti
Case Number: 4:2011cv00231
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 59 Order dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/23/12. (kpr)
February 7, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response to deft's 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment on or before 2/14/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/12. (vjt)
June 21, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Substitute D. Clifford Sward as counsel of record for the City of Little Rock in place of William C. Mann, III. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/21/11. (vjt)
April 25, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 City of Little Rock's Motion to Dismiss; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the City of Little Rock by mailing summons and complaint, along with a copy of this Order, to Mark Stodola, Mayor of Little Rock. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/11. (vjt)
March 28, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/28/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Little Rock Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Arkansas, City of
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Sheriff Department
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Motor Vehicles
Represented By: Paul M. Gehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Hill Wrecker Service Inc
Represented By: Clifford P. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Cornetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy S Harris, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?