Wilson v. Hutcherson et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Shane Wilson
Defendant: Chad Hutcherson and Lee Prickett
Case Number: 4:2011cv00264
Filed: March 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to file their Status Report by 10/15/2012. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/14/12. (vjt)
July 6, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' request for additional time in which to resolve this matter. The parties are directed to submit a status report on or before September 4, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/6/12. (kpr)
February 21, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 44 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Benton, City of, is granted; 46 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Shannon Hills, City of, Alexander, City of, Bryant, City of, Haskell, City of, and Bauxite, City of, is granted in part; all claims against the Cities of Shannon Hills, Haskell, Alexander, and Bauxite are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/21/12. (vjt)
January 10, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 MOTION of Nga Ostoja-Starzewski to Withdraw as counsel of record for defts Lee Prickett, and the City of Bryant. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/12. (vjt)
September 7, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 18 MOTION to Dismiss deft Chad Hutcherson, Individually & in his Official Capacity, without prejudice; Chad Hutcherson terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/7/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Hutcherson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Shane Wilson
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Hutcherson
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Prickett
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Nga C. Ostoja-Starzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?