Parkison v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Clinton Parkison
Defendant: Express Energy Services Ark LP, Express Energy Services GP LLC, Express Energy Services Operating LP, John Does, Halliburton Energy Services Inc, Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Chesapeake Operating Inc, Chesapeake Midstream Operating LLC, Chesapeake Midstream Gas Services LLC, Chesapeake Exploration LLC, Chesapeake Energy Marketing Inc, Nomac Drilling LLC and Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00265
Filed: March 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Parkison's claims against Express Energy Services Ark. LP, Express Energy Services GP, LLC, Express Energy Services Operating, LP, Nomac Drilling LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Chesapeake Midstream Operating LLC, Chesapeake M idstream Gas Services LLC, Chesapeake Exploration LLC, Chesapeake Energy Marketing Inc., and the John Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Parkison's claims against Chesapeake Energy Corp., Chesapeake Operating, Inc., and Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Eagle Precision Products and Argonaut Insurance Co.'s complaint in intervention against Parkison is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2014. (jak)
July 31, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 159 Motion to Dismiss. Parkinson's claims against Chesapeake Energy Corp., Chesapeake Operating Inc, and Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC are dismissed with prejudice. A one-day bench trial on the intervenor's third-party complaint will proceed at 8:30 a.m. on 13 August 2014 in Courtroom B155. Pretrial information sheets, witness lists, and exhibit lists due by 4 August 2014. A complete set of all exhibits is due in chambers by 8 August 2014. There will be no continuance of the trial date. There will be no extension of any of these deadlines. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2014. (jak)
May 6, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing all parties, counsel and representatives to bring cell phones, laptop computers, or personal digital assistants into the courthouse for the settlement conference scheduled for 05/29/2014 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 05/06/2014. (rhm)
March 20, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Parkinson's unopposed Motion for a mistrial for the reasons stated on the record on 19 March 2014. The trial is reset first out for 11 August 2014 at 9:30 a.m. The Court orders all the parties to participate in a settlement confe rence before Magistrate Judge Volpe sometime in May 2014. The completed videos and transcripts should be exchanged for review by 16 June 2014. Joint status report on any remaining evidentiary issues, and including necessary attachments, due by 30 June 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/2014. (jak)
March 11, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the reasons stated on the record at the 10 March 2014 pre-trial conference, The Court rules as follows: granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion in Limine; denying 94 Motion in Limine; denying 96 Motion in Limine; denying [9 8] Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion in Limine; denying 103 Motion in Limine; denying 105 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion in Limine; denying 109 Motion in Limine; denying 129 Motion to Strike ; withdrawing 132 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/11/2014. (jak)
December 16, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Parkison's claim for punitive damages is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/13. (kpr)
September 3, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion to Dismiss Party Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/3/13. (kpr)
March 15, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/15/12. (kpr)
July 8, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss of the Express Energy Defendants and dismissing those claims without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/8/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parkison v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Energy Services Ark LP
Represented By: Charles W. Lyford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Energy Services GP LLC
Represented By: Charles W. Lyford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Energy Services Operating LP
Represented By: Charles W. Lyford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Jerry L. Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wooster
Represented By: Michael Paul Vanderford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating Inc
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wooster
Represented By: Michael Paul Vanderford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Midstream Operating LLC
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wooster
Represented By: Michael Paul Vanderford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Midstream Gas Services LLC
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wooster
Represented By: Michael Paul Vanderford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Represented By: Michael Paul Vanderford
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wooster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Marketing Inc
Represented By: Michael Paul Vanderford
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wooster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomac Drilling LLC
Represented By: Michael Paul Vanderford
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wooster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC
Represented By: Michael Paul Vanderford
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wooster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Parkison
Represented By: Justin C. Zachary
Represented By: William R. Pointer, II
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?