Taylor v. Drugstore Cowboys Inc et al

Plaintiff: Lacey Taylor
Defendant: Drugstore Cowboys Inc and Convention Entertainment Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00269
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 97 Motion for Leave to File; granting 98 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The amended complaint must be filed no later than May 24, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/17/12. (kpr)
May 1, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 80 Motion for Sanctions; granting 94 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing plaintiffs' claims against defts Craig Snyder and Claude Skelton with prejudice; denying as moot 62 Skelton's Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/1/12. (kpr) (Docket entry modified on 5/1/2012 to establish linkage and correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
April 12, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 71 Motion to Strike ; denying 73 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Replies due by 6/8/2012); taking under advisement 80 Motion for Sanctions. The Clerk is directed to strike Document Nos. 67, 68, 69 and 70. Taylor, Jenson and Livdahl's joint status report is due by April 20, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/12. (kpr)
October 20, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER taking under advisement 13 Motion to Certify Class; denying 21 Motion to Strike ; granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James M. McHaney, Jr terminated; taking under advisement 30 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/20/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Drugstore Cowboys Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Taylor
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drugstore Cowboys Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convention Entertainment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?