Coles v. Hahn

Plaintiff: Cecil A Coles
Defendant: Herbert L Hahn
Case Number: 4:2011cv00272
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 97 Order dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/13. (kpr)
January 7, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ortho Arkansas Sports Medicine, Herbert L Hahn. The plaintiff is directed to respond to the motion by January 16, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/7/13. (kpr)
May 15, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 68 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/15/12. (vjt)
February 24, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 motion as moot. The defts should treat it as a request for production. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/24/12. (kpr)
January 26, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defts' 54 Motion to Compel is granted as modified; pltf is directed to file notice with the Court by 2/13/12 certifying that he has complied with this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/26/12. (vjt)
January 12, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 47 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The window for service is reopened. The U.S. Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and amended complaint on Baptist Health through its registered agent, Russell D. Harrington, Jr., 9601 I-630, Exit 7, Little Rock, Arkansas 72205, via certified mail, return receipt requested and is further directed to file proof of service by January 27, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11-272. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coles v. Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert L Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil A Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?