Hannahs v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Gabe Hannahs
Defendant: Carl Lynn Johnson, Speers, Randy Morgan and Doc Holladay
Case Number: 4:2011cv00278
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 183 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. 170 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/28/2014. (ks)
May 31, 2013 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 132 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; relieving attorney Lawrence Chisenhall as counsel in this matter; appointing Attorney Steven W. Quattlebaum; directing the Clerk to send Mr. Quattlebaum a copy of this Order; and directing Mr. Quattlebaum to review Local Rules 83.7 and 83.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/31/2013. (srw)
February 7, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Patty W. Lueken to represent Mr. Hannahs in all further proceedings in this case; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send Ms. Lueken a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/7/2013. (srw)
January 30, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects 117 Partial Report and Recommendations; denying 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 93 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/30/2013. (dmn)
August 27, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/27/12. (kpr)
December 9, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 47 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 41 MOTION for Default Judgment against Carl Lynn Johnson filed by Gabe Hannahs. The Clerk shall prepare summons for deft Johnson. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of th e complaint, amended complaints and summons on deft without prepayment of costs in care of Catherine M. Corless, Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard, PLLC, 425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800, Little Rock, AR 72201-3525Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/9/11. (kpr)
October 24, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Doc Holladay and Randy Morgan for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/24/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannahs v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabe Hannahs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Lynn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?