McDaniel v. Sprint Communications Company LP et al

Plaintiff: Don Wayne McDaniel
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company LP and Level 3 Communications LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00282
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the 52 Order and Judgment entered in this matter, the Court hereby lifts the stay and dismisses the case with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/26/2014. (ks)
March 27, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Fairness Hearing previously set for 8/17/12, is RESET for 12/6/12 at 1:00 p.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/27/12. (vjt)
March 23, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS, Preliminarily Approving Class-Action Settlement, and Approving Form and Manner of Notice 25 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/12. (vjt) (Modified on 3/23/2012 to correct typographical error).
February 10, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the stay in this matter and directing the parties to file a status report no later than 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/10/12. (vjt)
December 2, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the STAY should be continued and directing the parties to file a status report no later than 90 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/2/11. (vjt)
May 31, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Finalization of Settlement; the parties are directed to file a status report no later than six months from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/31/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Sprint Communications Company LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Wayne McDaniel
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: William T. Gotfryd
Represented By: Scott A. Powell
Represented By: Arthur T. Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level 3 Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?