Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Tidwell

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: John Stacy Tidwell
Case Number: 4:2011cv00337
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/14/2011. (dmn)
July 6, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel to either obtain local counsel and refile his motion for pro hac vice admission or become admitted to practice in this district by 5:00 p.m., Wednesday, July 20, 2011, or be removed from this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/6/11. (kpr)
May 31, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/31/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stacy Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Thomas P. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?