Gumby v. UPS Ground Freight Inc et al

Plaintiff: William Gumby
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Inc and Allen Howard
Case Number: 4:2011cv00340
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 258 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding that defts' 171 MOTION to Dismiss is hereby granted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/26/13. (vjt)
September 17, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part deft's 125 Motion to Quash and Request for Protective Order; pltf shall prepare an amended Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition as directed; parties are to notify the Court of the date of the deposition. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/17/12. (vjt)
August 20, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Motion to Compel; granting 98 Motion to Compel; granting 99 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order; denying 101 Motion to Exclude; granting 102 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 105 Motion for Protective Order; granting 112 Motion for Leave to File; the Court will enter an Amended Final Scheduling Order with new deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/20/12. (vjt)
June 21, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion to Amend Complaint and 73 Motion to Substitute Dolores Comstock, Special Administrator of the Estate of William Gumby, deceased, as the pltf; pltf is directed to file the second amended complaint within 7 days from the entry of this Order; denying pltf's 76 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/21/12. (vjt)
April 10, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the privilege log and the documents are covered by the attorney-client privilege or work product protection set forth in Fed.R.Evid. 502. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/10/12. (vjt)
March 23, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 46 Motion for Reconsideration of his motion to compel and for sanctions; defts are to provide the Court with the privilege log and any accompanying brief on or before 3/27/12. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/12. (vjt)
February 28, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 42 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/28/12. (vjt)
December 15, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 26 Motion to Strike; the Clerk is directed to STRIKE the 23 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/11. (vjt)
October 19, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' 15 Motion to Quash Depositions and Request for Emergency Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/19/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gumby v. UPS Ground Freight Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gumby
Represented By: Jessica Ann Virden
Represented By: Peter A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Howard
Represented By: Robert A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?