Sheets v. Edwards et al

Plaintiff: Brandon T Sheets
Defendant: Clayton Edwards, Jeff Hacker, Sanchez and Advanced Medical
Case Number: 4:2011cv00357
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court re 71 Order Adopting dismissing complaint with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/12/12. (kpr)
June 6, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (See docket entry 62 .)(kpr) (Docket text modified on 6/6/2012, per instructions from Chambers.) (thd).
April 26, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/26/12. (kpr)
March 14, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Plaintiff filed a notice of change of address on August 11, 2011. He is currently incarcerated at the Wrightsville Unit. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/14/12. (kpr)
June 27, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing deft Advanced Medical for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/27/11. (kpr)
June 9, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaints 2 8 , and this Order on defts Edwards, Hacker, and Sanchez without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheets v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon T Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?