Horton v. Chaney et al

Plaintiff: James D Horton, III
Defendant: C Chaney and M Harron
Case Number: 4:2011cv00358
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 121 Order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/26/2013. (dmn)
October 13, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's motions for a special master, for an audit, and to compel 52 53 55 are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/13/11. (vjt)
July 15, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 18 Motion for TRO. The Clerk is directed to update the docket sheet to reflect plaintiff's jury demand. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/15/11. (kpr)
June 1, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing the England Police Department as a party to this case, and certifying that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/1/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Chaney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Horton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Harron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?