Vest v. Battle

Plaintiff: Scott Vest
Defendant: Hayward Battle
Case Number: 4:2011cv00364
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/1/13. (kpr)
February 20, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Dan McDonald with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/20/13. (kpr)
September 10, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff shall have 30 days from the entry of this Order to serve Mr. McDonald. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/10/12. (kpr)
December 16, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Summary Judgment and the Clerk should terminate Battle as a deft in this action; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Amend/Correct, and directing Vest to file his amended complaint by December 23, 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)
September 6, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's response to the motion is due by October 15, 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vest v. Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Vest
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayward Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?