Murry v. Entergy Arkansas Inc et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth D Murry
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc and Entergy Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00368
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 34 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Entergy Arkansas Inc, and Entergy Services Inc dismissing the complaint of Kenneth D Murry with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/12. (vjt)
March 16, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 9 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motions Deadline; Motions due by 4/12/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/16/12. (vjt)
February 28, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 7 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murry v. Entergy Arkansas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D Murry
Represented By: John W. Walker
Represented By: Shawn Garrick Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Services Inc
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?