USA v. Lyons et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Terry Lynne Lyons, Judy Ann Lyons, Arkansas Department of Finance & Administration, First Security Bank and Arkansas Child Support Enforcement Office
Case Number: 4:2011cv00370
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in rem in favor of USA against Arkansas Child Support Enforcement Office, Judy Ann Lyons, Terry Lynne Lyons pursuant to 23 Order. Total judgment sum is $189,955.50, accrued to May 13, 2010, and interest thereafter at the daily rate of $17.53, in favor of the USA. The mortgage securing this indebtedness is foreclosed. If the indebtedness is not paid within 10 days from this date, the U.S. Marshal is directed to sell the property described herein at public auction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/27/12. (kpr)
September 12, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Default Judgment as to Terry Lynne Lyons, Judy Ann Lyons, his spouse, and the State of Arkansas, Office of Child Support Enforcement. The United States is directed to submit a foreclosure decree for the Court's approval and use in entering judgment in rem. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/12. (kpr) Modified on 9/12/2012 (kpr).
July 3, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving the Government until August 2, 2012 to serve Terry Lynne Lyons properly; and denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/3/12. (kpr)
June 11, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the United States to explain in terms of Rule of Civil Procedure 4 why good service exists on Mr. Lyons and the OCSE, supplementing the record if need be, by June 20, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/11/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Lyons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Lynne Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Ann Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Finance & Administration
Represented By: Michael Jay Wehrle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Security Bank
Represented By: Casey L. Cullipher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Child Support Enforcement Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?