Moore et al v. Sherman et al

Plaintiff: Alvester Moore and Sharon Moore
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, EMC Mortgage Services, Litton Loan Servicing LP, James Sherman, Jerry Johnson and Armstar Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2011cv00376
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for pltf's failure to prosecute this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/23/12. (vjt)
April 6, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file proof of service on defts by 4/20/12. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/6/12. (vjt)
March 23, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltfs to respond to the Court's 21 Order directing them to file a 26(f) Report no later than 14 days from the entry of this Order; failure to comply may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/12. (vjt)
January 9, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to file the Rule 26(f) Report forthwith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/9/12. (vjt)
September 1, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting pltfs' 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct the Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/1/11. (vjt)
July 25, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing Plaintiffs' claims against separate defendant Aurora Loan Services. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/25/11. (pag)
July 7, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltfs to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; pltfs are directed to file a response to 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aurora Loan Services on or before 7/22/11; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltfs by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/7/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Sherman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstar Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvester Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?