Ouachita Watch League et al v. Henry et al

Plaintiff: Ouachita Watch League, Newton County Wildlife Association, Shawn Porter, G Thomas McKinney, David Reagan, Susan Gateley, Robert B Leflar, Sarah May Leflar, Kimberly Ison, John Ison, Billy Lindsey, Carol Lindsey, James Mitchell, Ruth Mitchell and John Lawrence Poff
Defendant: Judith L Henry, United States Forest Service, Department of Agriculture, Department of Interior, Department of Defense and United States Department of the Army
Case Number: 4:2011cv00425
Filed: May 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30:181
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 116 Order entered on this date, the Federal Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted and it is considered, ordered and adjudged that these consolidated cases be, and are hereby, dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/16/2016. (ljb)
November 19, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. As a result of facts recently alleged in the 74 Supplemental Complaint filed 11/07/2014, Judge Baker recuses from this case in order to avoid any appearance of impropriety. The Clerk will reassign this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/19/2014. (rhm)
October 6, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 20 motion to dismiss. The Court dismisses OWL's claims regarding the Lake and OS's WSRA and Energy Policy Act Claims. OWL and OS's remaining claims survive defendants ' motion to dismiss. The parties are directed to file status report within 14 days of the date of this Order. The Court will enter a scheduling order following and based upon the parties' status reports. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/06/2014. (rhm)
October 18, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Defendants have 30 days from the date of this Order to comply with the prior Orders entered in this case on September 30, 2013 53 72 . Plaintiffs shall have 20 days from the deadline by which defendants are required to suppl ement the administrative record to respond to defendants motion to dismiss 30 . Defendants shall have 20 days from the date plaintiffs file their response to defendants motion to dismiss to file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/18/13. (kpr)
October 15, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Stay until Congress has restored appropriations to the federal government. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/13. (kpr)
September 30, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Compel. Defendants have 30 days from the date of this Order to comply with the terms of the Order and to supplement the administrative record. Pursuant to the Court's prior Order ente red on January 31, 2013, plaintiffs shall have 20 days from the deadline by which defendants are required to supplement the administrative record to respond to defendants motion to dismiss 68 . Further, this Court orders Ozark Society to enter its appearance in Case No. 4:11-cv-425 and to make all future filings in this case, as it is the lead case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/13. (kpr)
December 4, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the schedule proposed by the parties in their 40 stipulation, as set forth in this Order; finding as moot 32 Motion for Reconsideration and 32 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/4/12. (kpr)
October 31, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/31/12. (kpr)
May 1, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Compel and for Extension of Time; the motion to compel filing the administrative record is denied; the motion for additional time is granted; pltfs must respond to the 20 motion to dismiss within 110 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/1/12. (vjt)
February 3, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Compel Filing of the Administrative Record; defts must file the administrative record, and the parties must file their respective motions and briefs, pursuant to the schedule set forth in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/12. (vjt)
January 10, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/20/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ouachita Watch League et al v. Henry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ouachita Watch League
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newton County Wildlife Association
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Porter
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G Thomas McKinney
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Reagan
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gateley
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B Leflar
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah May Leflar
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ison
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ison
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Lindsey
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Lindsey
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mitchell
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Mitchell
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lawrence Poff
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith L Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?