Fatemi v. White et al

Plaintiff: Nasrin Fatemi
Defendant: James Clardy, Debra Fiser, John Day, University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences, University of Arkansas System and Charles White
Case Number: 4:2011cv00458
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 187 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 186 Order dismissing plaintiff's § 1983 claims with prejudice, and dismissing all other claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/13. (kpr)
April 5, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment . The Scheduling Order is suspended and the May 13th trial is cancelled. Claims, as set forth in this Order, are dismissed without prejudice. UAMS is dismissed as a defendant with prejudice. Title VII claims against Drs. Long, Clardy, Fiser and Day are dismissed with prejudice. The Court will address the outstanding claims in its companion Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/5/13. (kpr)
March 20, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER. Defendants and their lawyers shall not respond to Mr. Sutter's 3/15/13 FOI requests until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/13. (kpr)
December 4, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 57 Order allowing the amended answer. The 59 Motion for Reconsideration is denied on the merits. The motion for leave to file the amendment is granted 56 . The parties' joint report on a proposed schedule for accomplishi ng this addtl discovery is due by 12/10/12. Defts will bear the costs of r eopening any deposition taken between 7/1/12 and 10/23/12. Defts' motion for partial summary judgment is denied without prejudice to renewal after the addtl discovery is done. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/4/12. (kpr)
March 5, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Compel; denying 34 Motion for Protective Order and directing Plaintiff to produce documents, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/5/12. (kpr)
January 26, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/26/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fatemi v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Clardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Fiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasrin Fatemi
Represented By: Paul Gerard Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?