Jackson v. Pulaski County et al

Plaintiff: Cornell Jackson
Defendant: Pulaski County, Shawn Smith, James and Showell
Case Number: 4:2011cv00471
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 55 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to introduce sufficient evidence to create a fact issue to be submitted to a jury. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/13/12. (vjt)
October 12, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects 51 Partial Recommended Disposition; granting in part and denying in part 47 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants' motion is GRAN TED with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Shawn Smith, the claims against Smith are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Smith's name is removed as a party Defendant; and, denying Defendants' motion in all other respects. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/12/2012. (dmn)
September 23, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against deft Pulaski County are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Pulaski County terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/23/11. (vjt)
September 22, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, the correct name of deft Showell, and a notice confirming pltf's updated address; the Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to pltf at the ADC East Arkansas Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/22/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Pulaski County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Showell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornell Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?