Hearn v. BHP Billiton Petroleum (Arkansas) Inc et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Hearn
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Arkansas) Inc, BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC, Chesapeake Operating Inc and Clarita Operating LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00474
Filed: June 9, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 106 the parties' Joint Motion to Transfer the Claims of Jesse and Susan Frey to Case No. 4:13CV00184; and directing Case No. 4:11CV00475 be severed from Case No. 4:11CV00474 and consolidated with Case No. 4:13CV00184. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/20/2013. (srw)
January 23, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. An Amended Scheduling Order will be entered in due course. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/23/13. (kpr)
June 25, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Deep Six; Deep Six Water Disposal Services is dismissed without prejudice; 61 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Deep Six is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/25/12. (vjt)
January 9, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 45 Amended Complaint; Deep Six Water Disposal Services LLC will be given an additional 20 days to file an answer. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/9/12. (vjt)
December 13, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 38 MOTION to Amend; pltfs must file their amended complaint within seven days from the entry of this Order; defts' 19 Motion to DISMISS is therefore denied as moot; 42 Joint Motion for Stay of Class Certification Schedule is granted; the parties must propose another class certification schedule within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/13/11. (vjt)
December 6, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/6/11. (vjt)
November 18, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss re Sam and April Lane; granting 36 Motion to Dismiss re Randy and Joyce Palmer; Case No. 4:11CV00476 and Case No. 4:11CV00477 are dismissed without prejudice; said parties are dismissed as named pltfs in the Lead Case 4:11CV00474. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/11. (vjt)
November 1, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 33 Motion to Dismiss BHP Billiton Petroleum (Arkansas) Inc; BHP Billiton Petroleum (Arkansas) Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice; granting pltf's 32 MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including 11/30/11 to respond to BHP Petroleum's MOTION to Dismiss 19 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/1/11. (vjt)
September 15, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 27 Motion to Dismiss deft Clarita Operating LLC in all consolidated cases without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/15/11. (vjt)
September 1, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/14/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/11. (vjt)
August 31, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:11CV00475, 4:11CV00476, 4:11CV00477, with LEAD CASE 4:11CV00474 and for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; all pleadings are to be filed in the LEAD CASE, and the member cases will be administratively terminated; Emerson Poynter LLP and Wyly-Rommel PLLC are hereby appointed as interim class counsel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/31/11. (vjt)
August 24, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 17 Notice filed by Clarita Operating LLC, Attorneys Kimberly Logue and John F. Peiserich are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/24/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearn v. BHP Billiton Petroleum (Arkansas) Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hearn
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Arkansas) Inc
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating Inc
Represented By: Michelle P. Cullen
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spillyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarita Operating LLC
Represented By: Darrell W. Downs
Represented By: Kimberly Logue
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?