USA v. Dodge Intrepid 2000 VIN #2B3HD56J8YH174833

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Dodge Intrepid 2000 VIN #2B3HD56J8YH174833
Claimant: Kenneth Ray Irvin
Case Number: 4:2011cv00488
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon 26 motion of the parties, this matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/15/11. (vjt)
September 7, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RELEASE SEALED TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/7/11. (vjt)
August 4, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/9/2011 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes; the government is directed to ensure claimant Kenneth Ray Irvin's attendance at the trial. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/4/11. (vjt)
July 6, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; Kenneth Ray Irvin answer due 8/5/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/6/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Dodge Intrepid 2000 VIN #2B3HD56J8YH174833
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Karen D. Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge Intrepid 2000 VIN #2B3HD56J8YH174833
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kenneth Ray Irvin
Represented By: J. Blake Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?