Polk v. Pulaski County et al

Plaintiff: Allen Polk
Defendant: Ward, Elizandro, Woodward, Hunter, Nancy Brawley, Little Rock, City of, North Little Rock, City of, Stuart Thomas, Danny Bradley, Blankenship, John Does, Eddie Seaton, James McKenzie, Joe Gardner, Randy Morgan, Shawn Smith, Doc Holladay, Pulaski County and F G Villines, III
Case Number: 4:2011cv00501
Filed: June 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue and granting 91 Motion for Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/25/2012. (kcs)
October 25, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 57 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition and denying 53 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/25/2011. (dmn)
October 17, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting docket entry # 59 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/17/2011. (kcs)
October 6, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that the Plaintiff shall file, within thirty days, a Response to docket entry # 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eddie Seaton, James McKenzie. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely do so will result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/06/2011. (kcs)
September 7, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff shall file, within thirty days of the entry of the Order, a Response to docket entry # 21 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and th e instructions set forth in this Order. Failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/07/2011. (kcs)
August 30, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants Blankenship, Elizandro, Hunter, Ward, and Woodward shall file a Statement of Undisputed Material Facts within fourteen days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket sheet to reflect that Defendant Blanke nship is "Greg Blankenship," Defendant Elizandro is "William Elizandro," Defendant Hunter is "Shelby Hunter," Defendant Ward is "Robert Ward," Defendant Woodward is Jason Woodward. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/30/2011. (kcs)
August 8, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and allowing pltf to proceed with claims against defts Blankenship, Ward, Elizandro, Woodward, Hunter, Seaton and McKenzie. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for these defts and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, second amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees therefor. The Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/8/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Pulaski County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Brawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Little Rock, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F G Villines, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?