Delock et al v. Securitas Security Services USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Delock, Alisha Meredith, Eric Motley, Stephen Carlson, Deborah Goldhorn, Johnny Brown, Bobby Walker, Timothy Pierce, Brian Pease, Chris Wilson, Nichole Ledford and Brian Hathaway
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA Inc and Securitas Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00520
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JUDGMENT re 73 Order dismissing plaintiffs' claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/12. (kpr)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Directing the Clerk to add Steve Bucker as a Plaintiff per 64 Stipulation. Re 65 Joint Motion, The Court intends to give final approval and unseal the settlement documents promptly on 30 November 2012 unless the parties advise the Court before then that making the details public means there is no settlement and the cases should therefore stay on the docket for adjudication. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/16/2012. (mcz)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/1/12. (kpr)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 38 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 40 Motion to Stay; denying 55 Motion for Leave to File; granting 11 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 18 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/29/12. (kpr)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/5/11. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delock et al v. Securitas Security Services USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Delock
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Meredith
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Motley
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Carlson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Goldhorn
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Brown
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Walker
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Pierce
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Pease
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Wilson
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Ledford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hathaway
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA Inc
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Services Inc
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?