Richard et al v. Lonoke County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Richard, Ae Sayasavanh Samontry and Pornpiemon Phouangmany
Defendant: Lonoke County, Arkansas, Jim Roberson, James Kulesa, Keenan Carter, Kevin Blakely and Bonnie Blakely
Case Number: 4:2011cv00551
Filed: July 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 69 Opinion and Order entered separately today, all of the claims of the plaintiffs that arise under the constitution and laws of the United States are dismissed with prejudice. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the claims of the plaintiffs that arise under the laws of the State of Arkansas, so those claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/18/2014. (ks)
February 14, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing trial scheduled for 3/10/2014. This action is hereby removed from the docket for the week of 3/10/2014. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. 33 motion for new scheduling order and extension of time is moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/14/2014. (ks)
August 27, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 17 Motion to Stay; this action is hereby STAYED until the conclusion of pltfs' criminal case. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/27/12. (vjt)
November 15, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se deft Kevin Blakely to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Kevin Blakely by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/15/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard et al v. Lonoke County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Richard
Represented By: Reggie Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ae Sayasavanh Samontry
Represented By: Reggie Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pornpiemon Phouangmany
Represented By: Reggie Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonoke County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kulesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?