Habisreitinger v. Yarnell Ice Cream Company Inc

Plaintiff: Shane Habisreitinger
Defendant: Yarnell Ice Cream Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00563
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER administratively terminating this action pending resolution of or relief from the bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/30/11. (vjt)
August 10, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Yarnell Ice Cream Company Inc answer due 9/5/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/10/11. (vjt)
July 20, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Stuart J. Miller to Appear pro hac vice for pltf in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/20/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Habisreitinger v. Yarnell Ice Cream Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Habisreitinger
Represented By: M. Vance McCrary
Represented By: Joe P. Leniski
Represented By: Stuart J. Miller
Represented By: Mary E. Olsen
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Alex G. Streett
Represented By: James A. Streett
Represented By: David C. Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarnell Ice Cream Company Inc
Represented By: Kristen Collier Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?