Gaither v. Arkansas Foundation for Medical Care

Plaintiff: Clara C Gaither
Defendant: Arkansas Foundation for Medical Care
Case Number: 4:2011cv00576
Filed: July 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 77 Order dismissing this case, Case No. 4:12-v-373, and Case No. 4:13-cv-31 with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/21/13. (kpr)
February 25, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 56 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ms. Gaither has 30 days from the date of this Order to perfect service of the complaint in Case No. 4:12-cv-373-KGB. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/25/13. (kpr)
October 11, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Michael C. Angel to represent Ms. Gaither in all further proceedings. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Ms. Gaither and Mr. Angel a copy of this Order and a copy of Local Rule 83.7. The Clerk is further directed to send co pies of docket numbers 40, 41, 42, 43,45, and 46 to Ms. Gaither and Mr. Angel. Ms. Gaither shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to respond to deft's motion to dismiss and for sanctions and deft's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/11/12. (kpr)
September 11, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case no. 4:12-cv-373 shall be the member case. All further pleadings shall be filed in 4:11-cv-576 (lead case). Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/11/12. (kpr)
June 28, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Reconsideration re 35 Order denying Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/28/12. (kpr)
January 18, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting def's motion to quash and denying deft's 13 Motion to Dismiss. The Court will allow pltf an additional 30 days in which to perfect service on the deft. The service attempted by mail to John Clayborn is hereby deemed insufficient and is quashed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/18/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaither v. Arkansas Foundation for Medical Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara C Gaither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Foundation for Medical Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?