Luckadue v. Leader Newspaper Inc

Plaintiff: Laura L Luckadue
Defendant: Leader Newspaper Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00599
Filed: August 1, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Leader Newspaper Inc against Laura L Luckadue re 36 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/14/12. (kpr)
January 10, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Strike Pltf's Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents propounded on Garrick Feldman and Ilene Feldman. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/10/12. (kpr)
August 9, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before August 25, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/9/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luckadue v. Leader Newspaper Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leader Newspaper Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura L Luckadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?