Linzy v. Lawman et al

Plaintiff: Leon Linzy
Defendant: David Lawman and James Mayfield
Case Number: 4:2011cv00615
Filed: August 8, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the 35 Order entered on this date, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/14/2014. (mmd)
January 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying the time to respond to the 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Plaintiff's time to respond is stayed until one week after the entry of an Order from the Court addressing whether Mr. Lawman is required to reveal the name of the confidential source. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/17/14. (kpr)
October 25, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying the pending 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and plaintiff's time to respond to the pending motion until one week after the entry of an Order from the Court addressing whether Mr. Lawman is required to reveal the name of the confidential source; and granting 20 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/25/13. (kpr)
November 8, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this matter from the Court's trial docket for the week of November 13, 2012. The trial set will be reset by separate order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/8/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linzy v. Lawman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Linzy
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lawman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?