Farnsworth et al v. Welspun Tubular LLC et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Farnsworth and Matthew Moore
Defendant: Welspun Pipes Inc and Welspun Tubular LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00619
Filed: August 10, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Plaintiffs' claims in this case are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/28/2013. (dmn)
May 10, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 114 Judgment. The Court directs the parties to file a copy of the settlement agreement as soon as possible so the Court can evaluate it. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/10/13. (kpr)
April 17, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 113 Order dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/17/13. (kpr)
August 16, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/12. (kpr)
May 17, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re discovery. The Court encourages the parties to keep collaborating. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/17/12. (kpr)
March 27, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/12. (kpr)
March 15, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling defts' objection to the third-party subpoena, as well as objections to pltf's interrogs and requests for production, and to the scope of the planned Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. Defts have until May 15, 2012 to make the requested productions and disclosures; and the parties should reschedule the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition to occur after that date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/15/12. (kpr)
November 4, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Strike without prejudice. The Court directs defts to advise pltfs by letter by December 31, 2011, if they have not already done so by then, of the facts supporting the disputed defenses. The Court also requests that the parties focus on the important issues in the case rather than procedural wrangling. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farnsworth et al v. Welspun Tubular LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welspun Pipes Inc
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Donna S. Galchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welspun Tubular LLC
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Donna S. Galchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Farnsworth
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Gena A. Gregory
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane LaRue
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Moore
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Gena A. Gregory
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane LaRue
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?