Ilodianya v. Capital One Bank USA NA et al

Plaintiff: Emmanuel Ilodianya
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA, Experian Information Solutions Inc and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00637
Filed: August 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 Notice of Settlement filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. The trial is cancelled and the final scheduling order is suspended. The Court will enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice as to all defendants on July 26, 2013, unless some party requests some other relief before then. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/13. (kpr)
March 22, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/22/13. (kpr)
February 15, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/15/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ilodianya v. Capital One Bank USA NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Ilodianya
Represented By: Deborah Ann Linton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?