Gallo v. Dillard's Inc

Plaintiff: Daniel Gallo
Defendant: Dillard's Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00640
Filed: August 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Seal. The Court declines to seal the entire record. By 19 October 2015, Gallo must file a list of proposed redactions under seal. If the Court allows the redaction, Gallo will be required to file substituted pages with the confidential information covered up. By 19 October, 2015, Gallo must also file a list of documents for which he believes redaction is impracticable because the confidential information is so extensive and intertwined with the document as a whole. This list may be filed under seal too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2015. (jak)
January 9, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 32 Motion to Compel by Dillard's Inc; granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment by Dillard's Inc. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/9/2012. (mcz)
January 9, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion and vacating the earlier Judgment of the Court. Gallo should file his amended complaint by January 17, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/9/12. (kpr)
October 11, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 14 Order Dismissing Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/11/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallo v. Dillard's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gallo
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?