Magness v. Van Buren County Sheriff's Department

Plaintiff: John Wesley Magness
Defendant: Scott Bradley, Van Buren County Sheriff's Department and Randy Murray
Case Number: 4:2011cv00652
Filed: August 26, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 158 Order that was entered on this day it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/25/2013. (dmn)
September 13, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 132 Motion for Reconsideration re 131 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/13/12. (kpr)
December 20, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing Van Buren County Sheriff's Department as a deft in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/20/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magness v. Van Buren County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wesley Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?