Harris v. Southwest Power Pool Inc et al

Plaintiff: Lawanna Harris
Defendant: Brian Smith, Malinda See, Tom Dunn, Stacy Duckett and Southwest Power Pool Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00679
Filed: September 13, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/6/12. (kpr)
May 29, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting an oral request pursuant to General Order 54 to allow counsel for the parties, including Mike Riley, Brian Smith, Stacy Duckett and Nichole Thompson to bring cell phones, laptop computers, or personal digital asssistants into the courthouse for the 6/13/2012 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/29/2012. (kcs)
February 28, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that pltf's 34 MOTION for Protective Order or to Compel is DENIED; pltf's 41 MOTION to Stay the Scheduling Order is likewise DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/12. (vjt)
November 8, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that pltf's 23 Motion for Collective Action under the FLSA is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE; her request regarding the briefing dates for the proposed state-law class is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/8/11. (vjt)
September 30, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 13 Motion for Order Prohibiting Class Contact and for TRO. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/30/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Southwest Power Pool Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malinda See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Duckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Power Pool Inc
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Represented By: P. Delanna Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawanna Harris
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?