Helena Chemical Company et al v. Skinner et al

Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company and Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: John Boswell Skinner, Jr, Thomas Chris Coleman, Kurt Nelson Catlett, Adam Ross Catlett and Wayne Norman Bass
Counter_claimant: Adam Ross Catlett, Kurt Nelson Catlett and John Boswell Skinner, Jr
Counter_defendant: Helena Chemical Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv00691
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's motions to compel 121 123 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/5/12. (vjt)
May 16, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot deft Skinner's 113 Motion to Compel; depositions may resume on June 5, 2012. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/16/12. (vjt)
April 27, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that separate defts' motions to stay this case 90 92 93 95 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; separate defts' motions for extension of time to answer pltfs' second amended complaint 100 101 103 are GRANTED; defts have up to and including 7 days from the entry of this Order to answer. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/27/12. (vjt)
April 9, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 79 Motion to Deem Admitted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/9/12. (vjt)
March 16, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 72 Motion to Deem Admitted re requests for admissions served on deft Coleman. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/16/12. (vjt)
January 26, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Quash; pltf's Motions to Compel 44 47 are GRANTED; Simmons First Bank and First Security Bank are hereby ORDERED to comply with this Order within 14 days; the Motions for More Definite Statements of Counterclaims 38 40 42 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/26/12. (vjt)
October 27, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Catlett's 32 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/27/11. (vjt)
October 4, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 20 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/4/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Chemical Company et al v. Skinner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Adam Ross Catlett
Represented By: Charles P. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kurt Nelson Catlett
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: John Boswell Skinner, Jr
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Represented By: Brian A. Pipkin
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer T. McLean
Represented By: C. David Hailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Boswell Skinner, Jr
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Chris Coleman
Represented By: Danny W. Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Nelson Catlett
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Ross Catlett
Represented By: Charles P. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Norman Bass
Represented By: Donald E. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Helena Chemical Company
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Brian A. Pipkin
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Brian A. Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?