Access Mediquip LLC v. St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center

Plaintiff: Access Mediquip LLC
Defendant: St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2011cv00695
Filed: September 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 motion to exclude and 64 third motion for summary judgment. 80 Motion for leave to file a surreply is denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/2014. (ks)
January 28, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has determined that the jury trial of this matter scheduled for 2/10/2014 should be continued due to the Court's schedule. A new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/28/2014. (ks)
January 2, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion to Seal exhibits in support of 62 MOTION to Exclude. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/2/2014. (ks)
September 21, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that 14 St. Vincent's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Count I (breach of contract) and Count III (unjust enrichment) of the complaint and GRANTED as to Count II (Arkansas Deceptive Trade Practices Act) of the complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/21/12. (vjt)
July 25, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Motions Deadline; all motions except motions in limine due by 8/6/2012. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/25/12. (vjt)
June 28, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Discovery due by 7/30/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/28/12. (vjt)
March 2, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/2/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Access Mediquip LLC v. St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Vincent Infirmary Medical Center
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Access Mediquip LLC
Represented By: Karen Turner-Fry
Represented By: Richard T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?