Jones v. Gann et al

Plaintiff: Charles Edward Jones, Sr
Defendant: Chris Gann, D Kirby Wright, Brandi Turner and Jill Kamp
Case Number: 4:2011cv00701
Filed: September 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 27 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/18/12. (vjt)
January 11, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 24 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Chris Gann, and D Kirby Wright dismissing the complaint of Charles Edward Jones, Sr.; pltf's federal law claims are dismissed with prejudice, and the state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/11/12. (vjt)
November 28, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's amended complaint against Turner and Kamp is dismissed; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons and amended complaint on defts Gann and Wright; denying as moot pltf's 13 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum. Jill Kamp and Brandi Turner terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/28/11. (vjt)
October 17, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 5 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/17/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Gann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Kirby Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Kamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Jones, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?