CMS Wireless LLC v. Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland et al

Plaintiff: CMS Wireless LLC
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Crown Management Inc, Crown Project Management Inc, Prince & Associates, C Prince & Associates Consulting Inc and AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00755
Filed: October 17, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 165 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of CMS Wireless LLC against C Prince & Associates Consulting Inc, Crown Project Management Inc, Prince & Associates, and Michelle Chow. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 5/31/2013. (dmn)
January 24, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring 51 MOTION for Default Judgment, which the Court will treat as a Motion for Clerk's Default, to the Clerk of the Court for consideration.. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/24/12. (kpr)
December 9, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration re 25 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by C Prince & Associates Consulting Inc, Prince & Associates, Crown Management Inc ; granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and directing the plaintiff to file its Third Amended Complaint by 5:00 p.m., Friday, December 16, 2011. The Clerk's Default entered on November 3, 2011, is premature and therefore is set aside. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/9/11. (kpr)
November 3, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring the 18 Motion for Default Judgment to the Clerk of the Court for consideration of entry of a Clerk's default. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/3/11. (kpr)
October 25, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Strike 5 Answer to Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/25/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMS Wireless LLC v. Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMS Wireless LLC
Represented By: J. Richard Newland, Jr.
Represented By: Joel Franklin Hoover
Represented By: Andrew Bost Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Kathleen M. LaValle
Represented By: Patrick Darrow Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Project Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Prince & Associates Consulting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Kathleen M. LaValle
Represented By: Patrick Darrow Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?