Xpedx v. Jonesboro Paper & Chemical LLC et al

Plaintiff: Xpedx
Defendant: Jonesboro Paper & Chemical LLC and Paul Wallis
Case Number: 4:2011cv00763
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the 39 Order entered in favor of Paul Wallis in the amount of $214,547.08. This amount includes $168,298.49 recovery on the guaranty for the unpaid debt, $20,527.80 of prejudgment interest starting on 8/25/2010, $476.02 in costs, and $25,244.77 in attorney fees. All claims against Jonesboro Paper were discharged in bankruptcy, and those claims were therefore dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/5/12. (kpr)
August 2, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and directing the Clerk to redesignate 33 Motion to Withdraw, as a notice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/02/2012. (jak)
July 13, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing, with prejudice, Xpedx's claim against Jonesboro Paper. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/12. (kpr)
July 11, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to resend a copy of the Court's July 2nd 26 Order to Paul Wallis at 4801 Peachtree Avenue, Jonesboro, AR 72401, by certified mail, return receipt requested, restricted delivery. The Clerk shall file the green card once received. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/11/12. (kpr)
July 2, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Paul Wallis to move to reopen his time to respond to the motion papers and to tender a proposed response by July 31, 2012. The Court will hold a hearing on Xpedx's motion for summary judgment at 3:00 on August 28, 2012 in Courtr oom B-155 of the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order directly to Paul Wallis by certified mail, return receipt requested, and to file the green card once received. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xpedx v. Jonesboro Paper & Chemical LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xpedx
Represented By: Mary Galchus Cooper
Represented By: M. Stephen Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Paper & Chemical LLC
Represented By: Warren E. Dupwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Wallis
Represented By: Warren E. Dupwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?