Russell v. Motorola Inc Mobile Business Devices et al

Plaintiff: Larry Craig Russell
Defendant: John Martens, Motorola Inc Mobile Business Devices, Dorothy Hodges, Susan Kane, Russell Cellular-Verizon and Matthew Quigley
Case Number: 4:2011cv00764
Filed: October 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 81 Order dismissing plaintiff's claims against defendants with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/13. (kpr)
June 29, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Seal; granting 42 Motion to Compel and giving plaintiff until July 13, 2012 to provide Motorola with the information outlined in this Order; and denying 46 Motion to Dismiss. The Court reopens the window for service until July 30, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/12. (kpr)
June 28, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Larry Craig Russell to bring his cellular telephone to the June 28, 2012 hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/28/12. (kpr)
February 15, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss Parties. Defts Dorothy Hodges, Susan Kane, Matthew Quigley and John Martens are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/15/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Motorola Inc Mobile Business Devices et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Inc Mobile Business Devices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Cellular-Verizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Craig Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?