Robinson v. American Red Cross

Plaintiff: Ellen Robinson
Defendant: American Red Cross
Case Number: 4:2011cv00768
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 64 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/3/2013. (dmn)
May 2, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving plaintiff a one-week extension of time to Thursday, May 9, 2013, in which to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment 51 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/2/13. (kpr)
January 11, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 28 Motion to Partially Dismiss pltf's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/11/12. (vjt)
November 29, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER once again directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; pltf shall timely claim the certified mail or notify the Court as directed; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/29/11. (vjt)
October 27, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 11 Motion to Seal Documents that are attached to pltf's complaint; pltf shall file an amended complaint as directed within 20 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/27/11. (vjt)
October 26, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/26/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. American Red Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Red Cross
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?