Ozark Society v. United States Forest Service et al

Plaintiff: Ozark Society
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Judith Henry, Bureau of Land Management, John Lyon and Bruce Dawson
Case Number: 4:2011cv00782
Filed: October 31, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 116 Order filed in lead case 4:11-cv-00425, the Federal Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted and it is considered, ordered and adjudged that these consolidated cases be, and are hereby, dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/16/2016. (ljb)
November 19, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. As a result of facts recently alleged in the 74 Supplemental Complaint filed November 7, 2014, in Case No. 4:11CV00425, Judge Baker recuses from this case in order to avoid any appearance of impropriety. The Clerk will reassign this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/19/2014. (rhm)
October 6, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 30 motion to dismiss. The Court dismisses OWL's claims regarding the Lake and OS's WSRA and Energy Policy Act Claims. OWL and OS's remaining claims survive defendants ' motion to dismiss. The parties are directed to file status report within 14 days of the date of this Order. The Court will enter a scheduling order following and based upon the parties' status reports. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/06/2014. (rhm)
October 18, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/18/13. (kpr)
October 15, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Motion to Stay until Congress has restored appropriations to the federal government. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/13. (kpr)
September 30, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Compel supplementation of the administrative record and to extend the schedule for filing a response to defts' motions to dismiss (Case No. 4:11-cv-425, doc. no. 45; Case No. 4:11-cv-782, doc. no. 64). Further, this Court orders Ozark Society to enter its appearance in Case No. 4:11-cv-00425 and to make all future filings in this case, as it is the lead case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/13. (kpr)
March 23, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ozark Society is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ozark Society v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler G. Welti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Henry
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler G. Welti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler G. Welti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lyon
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler G. Welti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Dawson
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler G. Welti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozark Society
Represented By: Samuel E. Ledbetter
Represented By: Ross Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?