Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Phillips et al

Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Alday S Phillips, Korwyn A Miller, Keylon K Phillips, Alfredrick Phillips, Jr, Dominique Watson, Melissa Grimes and Ford Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2011cv00799
Filed: November 4, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the settlement agreement between the remaining parties, the Clerk shall distribute the funds interpled into the registry of the Court, the sum of $187,022.18, plus accrued interest, to the defts as directed; upon disbursement of the funds, this matter is hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/11/12. (vjt)
April 10, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; the Clerk is directed to distribute from the funds interpled into the registry of the Court the amount of $9,878.20 to Ford Acceptance Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/10/12. (vjt)
April 4, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se deft KORWYN A. MILLER to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on separate deft by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/4/12. (vjt)
February 22, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's request to be allowed to deposit proceeds of the life insurance policy, $188,000 into the registry of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Staci Dumas Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alday S Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korwyn A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keylon K Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredrick Phillips, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Charles Monroe Finkenbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?