Stephen L LaFrance Holdings Inc et al v. Sorensen et al

Plaintiff: Stephen L LaFrance Holdings Inc, Stephen L LaFrance Pharmacy Inc and Super D Acquisition Company Inc
Defendant: Garret Sorensen, Katherine Sorensen, Shannon Walters and Multi-Media Management
Intervenor: USA
Miscellaneous: David P Martin, Ryan Solomon and Jason P LaFrance
Case Number: 4:2011cv00807
Filed: November 9, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 76 Motion for Sanctions; granting 77 Motion for Attorney Fees and directing Solomon to pay Sorensen $10,000 in attorney's fees; denying 78 Motion for Attorney Fees. A total penalty of $4,000 is imposed on the Government to be paid into the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/1/12. (kpr)
January 19, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving counsel for Garret Sorensen and Katherine Sorensen up to and including Thursday, January 26, 2012, to file a brief reply to the Government's 80 Response to Motion. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/19/12. (kpr)
January 5, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 72 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Katerine Sorenson. Ms. Sorenson is given until 3:00 p.m., Thursday, January 12, 2012, to submit a revised claim. Respondent's ddl for responding to the revised claim is 3:00 p.m., Thursday, January 19, 2012. Respondent need not reply to the current motion, as it is moot. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/5/12. (kpr)
December 13, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting deft Garret Sorensen's Second Supplement to Rule 37 Motion 22 , as to costs and attorneys' fees against Mr. Solomon, but otherwise denying. Defts may file a motion for R ule 11 sanctions against the Government. All other pending motions are denied as moot 10 12 13 14 15 16 . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/13/11. (kpr)
December 9, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 64 Order. The Court is not ordering a formal transcript of the hearing in this matter and plans to enter an order without it. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/9/11. (kpr)
December 8, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER. The official transcript should be available sometime next week. The Order is anticipated to be entered shortly after the official transcript is received. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/8/11. (kpr) (Docket text modified on 12/8/2011 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
November 9, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs' counsel to pay reasonable costs of an expedited copy of the deposition taken Monday. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/9/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen L LaFrance Holdings Inc et al v. Sorensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: USA
Represented By: Angela S. Jegley
Represented By: Patricia Sievers Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen L LaFrance Holdings Inc
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Represented By: David P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen L LaFrance Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Represented By: David P. Martin
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super D Acquisition Company Inc
Represented By: David P. Martin
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Represented By: Joe Ryan Solomon
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garret Sorensen
Represented By: Ted Boswell
Represented By: Patrick R. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Sorensen
Represented By: Erin Cassinelli
Represented By: Patrick R. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Walters
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multi-Media Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: David P Martin
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Troy A. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Ryan Solomon
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Troy A. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Jason P LaFrance
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?