Sample v. Verspeeten Cartage LTD et al

Plaintiff: Ted Sample
Defendant: David Klassen, Agatha Klassen and Verspeeten Cartage LTD
Case Number: 4:2011cv00828
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 93 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by David Klassen, Agatha Klassen, Verspeeten Cartage Ltd. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/29/12. (kpr)
October 25, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial calendar for the week of January 28, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/25/12. (kpr)
October 15, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 39 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sample v. Verspeeten Cartage LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Klassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agatha Klassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verspeeten Cartage LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Sample
Represented By: C. Mark Donahoe
Represented By: David Hardee
Represented By: Bradley J. Owens
Represented By: Joseph H. Purvis
Represented By: Matthew E. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?