Watson et al v. Surf-Frac Wellhead Equipment Company Inc

Plaintiff: Jason Stiller, Sr, Jason Stiller, Jr, Alvin Bellamy and Bennie Watson
Defendant: Surf-Frac Wellhead Equipment Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00843
Filed: November 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 11, 2013 Order 93 . The Court grants the parties' motion and adds as plaintiffs Bobby Bryant, Jr., Dwayne Ray Swafford, Jeremy Askins, David Clell Light, Kip Guthrie , Justin Jackson, Kanen Skinner, and Michael Schrimsher. The Court orders that the complaint and all claims in this action against defendants are dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/20/13. (kpr)
November 14, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 115 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re 93 Order, And Agreed Order of Dismissal. The Court directs the parties to submit the appropriate filings to permit this Court to evaluate the settlement. The Court directs that these filings be made under seal. The Court must approve the settlement before entering an order of dismissal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/14/13. (kpr)
October 18, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 84 110 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/18/13. (kpr)
October 15, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a telephone pretrial hearing on 81 MOTIONS in Limine 84 for Thursday, October 17, 2013, beginning at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/13. (kpr)
October 11, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 58 MOTION to Vacate 21 Order, and Decertify the Collective Action filed by Surf-Frac Wellhead Equipment Company Inc. and the 88 Objection filed by Surf-Frac Wellhead Equipment Company Inc. It is ordered that the claims of all opt-in plaintiffs are dismissed without prejudice and the statute of limitations on their claims be tolled from the date each plaintiff opted in until today's date. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/11/13. (kpr)
October 3, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' 52] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 56 defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and granting 58 Motion to decertify the collective action. The Court will schedule a telephone hearing on plaintiffs' request that opt-in plaintiffs be added to the case as named plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/3/13. (kpr)
October 18, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 8 motion for certification of collective action, for disclosure of contact information for potential opt-in plaintiffs, and to send court-approved notice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/18/2012. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson et al v. Surf-Frac Wellhead Equipment Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Stiller, Sr
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Stiller, Jr
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Bellamy
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Watson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surf-Frac Wellhead Equipment Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?