Glaze v. Weaver et al

Plaintiff: Chariell Ali Glaze
Defendant: Faulkner County Arkansas Circuit Court, Ray Hobbs, Susan K Weaver and Gaylon Lay
Case Number: 4:2011cv00881
Filed: December 12, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 67 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 60 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and this cause of action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/4/13. (vjt)
December 4, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/4/2012. (srw)
April 26, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims against Susan K. Weaver and the Faulkner County Circuit Court. Plaintiff's claims against Ray Hobbs and Gaylon Lay remain, and the Clerk is directed to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons and complaint on these defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/26/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaze v. Weaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County Arkansas Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan K Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chariell Ali Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?