Palermo v. Arkansas Homecare of Hot Springs LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tammy Palermo
Defendant: Arkansas Homecare of Hot Springs LLC and LHC Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00913
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/21/13. (kpr)
September 10, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting defts' motion to extend time to conduct depositions and plaintiff's oral motion for continuance of the trial date and for a new scheduling order. The Court will set a new trial date and issue a new scheduling order by separate order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/10/12. (kpr)
August 21, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/21/12. (kpr)
July 13, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice and admitting Jessica L. Garner to appear as co-counsel for the defts. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/13/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palermo v. Arkansas Homecare of Hot Springs LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Palermo
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Homecare of Hot Springs LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHC Group Inc
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?